NY A06396 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to coverage for eating disorders; requires comparable coverage for adults and children with eating disorders; defines eating disorder.
Title
Relates to coverage for eating disorders; requires comparable coverage for adults and children with eating disorders; defines eating disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6396c |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.458 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6396b |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.537 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | print number 6396a |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06045 (Same As) 2018-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 6045C