NY A06395 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7194
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7194
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all funds received by the state as the result of a settlement or a judgement in litigation against opioid manufacturers, distributors, dispensers, consultants or resellers shall be deposited into the opioid settlement fund, and that such funds shall not supplant or replace existing state funding.
Title
Requires all funds received by the state as the result of a settlement or a judgement in litigation against opioid manufacturers, distributors, dispensers, consultants or resellers shall be deposited into the opioid settlement fund, and that such funds shall not supplant or replace existing state funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s7194 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.665 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | print number 6395b |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 6395a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |