NY S07194 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all funds received by the state as the result of a settlement or a judgement in litigation against opioid manufacturers, distributors, dispensers, consultants or resellers shall be deposited into the opioid settlement fund, and that such funds shall not supplant or replace existing state funding.
Title
Requires all funds received by the state as the result of a settlement or a judgement in litigation against opioid manufacturers, distributors, dispensers, consultants or resellers shall be deposited into the opioid settlement fund, and that such funds shall not supplant or replace existing state funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.10 |
2021-06-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.190 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.665 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a6395b |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1612 |
2021-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06395 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7194