NY A06363 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the task force to explore the incorporation of the principles of universal design for learning into the education systems in the state.
Title
Establishes the task force to explore the incorporation of the principles of universal design for learning into the education systems in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | print number 6363a |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2013-03-26 | Assembly | referred to education |