NY A06335 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - print number 6335b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - print number 6335b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an online insurance verification system for proof of insurance; allows the use of third-party vendors and providers; requires motor vehicle insurers to provide policy information to the online verification system; establishes an online insurance verification advisory council; requires certain information to be confidential and propriety information which is not subject to disclosure.
Title
Establishes an online insurance verification system for proof of insurance; allows the use of third-party vendors and providers; requires motor vehicle insurers to provide policy information to the online verification system; establishes an online insurance verification advisory council; requires certain information to be confidential and propriety information which is not subject to disclosure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 6335b |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | print number 6335a |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04871 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to transportation