NY A06307 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - print number 6307a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - print number 6307a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a health care proxy registry within the department of health to maintain the health care proxies of persons electing to submit proxies to such registry and to provide access thereto by attending health care providers and the principal of the health care proxy.
Title
Establishes a health care proxy registry within the department of health to maintain the health care proxies of persons electing to submit proxies to such registry and to provide access thereto by attending health care providers and the principal of the health care proxy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Assembly | print number 6307a |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06081 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - referred to health