NY A06255 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York state energy research and development authority to study significantly improving high-performance efficiency in commercial office buildings.
Title
Authorizes the New York state energy research and development authority to study significantly improving high-performance efficiency in commercial office buildings.
Sponsors
Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Joseph Lentol [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] |
Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | signed chap.297 |
2018-09-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.716 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6160 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.912 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S06160 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6255