NY A06236 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to an exemption for certain property located in Saratoga county from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a church.
Title
Relates to an exemption for certain property located in Saratoga county from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a church.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6019 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.341 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.341 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06019 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.362