NY A06205 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - print number 6205a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - print number 6205a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the department of health may conduct education and outreach programs promoting public awareness of the dangers of fatal and non-fatal drowning.
Title
Provides that the department of health may conduct education and outreach programs promoting public awareness of the dangers of fatal and non-fatal drowning.
Sponsors
Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] |
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Eddie Gibbs [D] | Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Assembly | print number 6205a |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05815 (Same As) 2024-02-14 - referred to ways and means