NY A06190 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s4895a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s4895a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Mercy Haven, Inc. to file an application with the town of Islip for a real property tax exemption for the 2018-2019 assessment roll for a certain parcel located in Central Islip.
Title
Allows Mercy Haven, Inc. to file an application with the town of Islip for a real property tax exemption for the 2018-2019 assessment roll for a certain parcel located in Central Islip.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s4895a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.448 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | print number 6190a |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04895 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.293