NY S04895 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.293
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.293
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Mercy Haven, Inc. to file an application with the town of Islip for a real property tax exemption for the 2018-2019 assessment roll for a certain parcel located in Central Islip.
Title
Allows Mercy Haven, Inc. to file an application with the town of Islip for a real property tax exemption for the 2018-2019 assessment roll for a certain parcel located in Central Islip.
Sponsors
Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.293 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.448 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a6190a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.947 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4895A |
2021-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-02-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06190 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s4895a