NY A06167 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - print number 6167a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - print number 6167a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes state agencies to publish and transmit certain rule making notices by electronic means; provides for the provision of the state register by electronic means; authorizes the legislative administrative regulations review commission to accept data transmitted by electronic means.
Title
Authorizes state agencies to publish and transmit certain rule making notices by electronic means; provides for the provision of the state register by electronic means; authorizes the legislative administrative regulations review commission to accept data transmitted by electronic means.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Assembly | print number 6167a |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01237 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - referred to governmental operations