NY S01237 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes state agencies to publish and transmit certain rule making notices by electronic means; provides for the provision of the state register by electronic means; authorizes the legislative administrative regulations review commission to accept data transmitted by electronic means.
Title
Authorizes state agencies to publish and transmit certain rule making notices by electronic means; provides for the provision of the state register by electronic means; authorizes the legislative administrative regulations review commission to accept data transmitted by electronic means.
Sponsors
Sen. David Valesky [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.635 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1237A |
2018-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1389 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A06167 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - print number 6167a