NY A06054 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s3183a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s3183a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes citizens arrests in New York state.
Title
Abolishes citizens arrests in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s3183a |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.572 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03183 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - referred to codes