NY A06037 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - signed chap.131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - signed chap.131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of hookahs, smoking paraphernalia and shisha to minors.
Title
Prohibits the sale of hookahs, smoking paraphernalia and shisha to minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-15 | Senate | signed chap.131 |
2011-07-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1540 |
2011-06-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4269A |
2011-06-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | amended by restoring to previous print 6037a |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.469 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.469 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | print number 6037b |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | print number 6037a |
2011-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2011-03-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04269 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6037A