NY A05942 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ensuring fairness in the value of gifted goods.
Title
Relates to ensuring fairness in the value of gifted goods.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.121 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.121 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-03-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |