NY A05918 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a foreign corporation's application for authority to do business in this state constitutes consent to jurisdiction of the courts of this state and a surrender of such application constitutes withdrawal of such consent.
Title
Provides that a foreign corporation's application for authority to do business in this state constitutes consent to jurisdiction of the courts of this state and a surrender of such application constitutes withdrawal of such consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.421 |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.126 |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05889 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY