NY A05915 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s1566a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s1566a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires banks to provide written notification that accepting an alternative loan payment schedule may have a negative impact on credit scores; makes related provisions.
Title
Requires banks to provide written notification that accepting an alternative loan payment schedule may have a negative impact on credit scores; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s1566a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.194 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 5915a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to banks |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S01566 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.568