NY A05854 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding the definition of agency; includes entities created by an agency or that are governed by a board of directors or similar body a majority of which is designated by one or more state or local government officials in the definition of agency under the public officers law.
Title
Relates to expanding the definition of agency; includes entities created by an agency or that are governed by a board of directors or similar body a majority of which is designated by one or more state or local government officials in the definition of agency under the public officers law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | print number 5854a |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04775 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES