NY S04775 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding the definition of agency; includes entities created by an agency or that are governed by a board of directors or similar body a majority of which is designated by one or more state or local government officials in the definition of agency under the public officers law.
Title
Relates to expanding the definition of agency; includes entities created by an agency or that are governed by a board of directors or similar body a majority of which is designated by one or more state or local government officials in the definition of agency under the public officers law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.150 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4775A |
2017-05-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05854 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations