NY A05823 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5023a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5023a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires veterinarians to report suspected animal cruelty to the police, duly incorporated society for the prevention of cruelty to animals, peace officer, district attorney's office, animal control officer, department of agriculture and markets, or other appropriate government agency and to turn over necessary records; protects the identity of such veterinarians; allows such veterinarians to receive a copy of such report.
Title
Requires veterinarians to report suspected animal cruelty to the police, duly incorporated society for the prevention of cruelty to animals, peace officer, district attorney's office, animal control officer, department of agriculture and markets, or other appropriate government agency and to turn over necessary records; protects the identity of such veterinarians; allows such veterinarians to receive a copy of such report.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s5023a |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.568 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 5823a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05023 (Same As) 2021-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.546