NY A05790 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - print number 5790b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - print number 5790b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reporting and posting by assisted living facilities relating to quality measures and information concerning rates, rent, and service fees; requires a scoring system of the assisted living quality reporting.
Title
Requires reporting and posting by assisted living facilities relating to quality measures and information concerning rates, rent, and service fees; requires a scoring system of the assisted living quality reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] |
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Assembly | print number 5790b |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | print number 5790a |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08865 (Same As) 2024-03-22 - REFERRED TO AGING