NY A05776 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 5776c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 5776c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits agreements between employers that directly restrict the current or future employment of any employee and allows for a cause of action against employers who engage in such agreements.
Title
Prohibits agreements between employers that directly restrict the current or future employment of any employee and allows for a cause of action against employers who engage in such agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5776c |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.220 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5776b |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.252 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | print number 5776a |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03937 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES