NY A05765 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-21 - print number 5765a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-21 - print number 5765a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the emergency medical technician re-certification demonstration program throughout the state; extends the length of such re-certification from five years to seven years.
Title
Expands the emergency medical technician re-certification demonstration program throughout the state; extends the length of such re-certification from five years to seven years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Assembly | print number 5765a |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03106 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES