NY A05727 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts owners of farms and the owners of multiple dwellings from complying with the scaffold law in certain instances.
Title
Exempts owners of farms and the owners of multiple dwellings from complying with the scaffold law in certain instances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | held for consideration in labor |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08223 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR