NY A05615 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the county of Hamilton to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by mortgages on real property.
Title
Relates to authorizing the county of Hamilton to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by mortgages on real property.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4127 |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.420 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04127 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.296