NY A05610 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the vacating of an arbitration award on the basis of arbitrator disregard of the law.
Title
Authorizes the vacating of an arbitration award on the basis of arbitrator disregard of the law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.212 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.89 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02396 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY