NY A05571 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - print number 5571a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - print number 5571a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to instant run-off elections in cities with a population of one million or more.
Title
Relates to instant run-off elections in cities with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. Victor Pichardo [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Assembly | print number 5571a |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04586 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - referred to election law