NY A05533 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a service learning program for students serving as active volunteer firefighters or volunteer ambulance workers, and mandates certain features of such program.
Title
Creates a service learning program for students serving as active volunteer firefighters or volunteer ambulance workers, and mandates certain features of such program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-05-12 | Assembly | reference changed to higher education |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01441 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES