NY A05459 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to video lottery gaming devices in the Suffolk region.
Title
Relates to video lottery gaming devices in the Suffolk region.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Murray [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] |
Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R] | Asm. Alfred Graf [R] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | print number 5459a |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04170 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING