NY A05451 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-30)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4467c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4467c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the licensing of licensed orientation and mobility specialists and vision rehabilitation therapists.
Title
Provides for the licensing of licensed orientation and mobility specialists and vision rehabilitation therapists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4467c |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.646 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | print number 5451c |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | print number 5451b |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | print number 5451a |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04467 (Same As) 2015-12-11 - VETOED MEMO.295