NY A05410 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the NYC housing authority to include a notice informing a prospective tenant or current tenant of the ability to add legal occupants to the lease or renewal lease and to provide a form to add the additional legal occupants.
Title
Requires the NYC housing authority to include a notice informing a prospective tenant or current tenant of the ability to add legal occupants to the lease or renewal lease and to provide a form to add the additional legal occupants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | signed chap.171 |
2020-09-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.781 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5342A |
2020-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.356 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | print number 5410a |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05342 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.171