NY A05405 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s2550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s2550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2015 to November 30, 2017, the authorization granted to the county of Tompkins to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2015 to November 30, 2017, the authorization granted to the county of Tompkins to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s2550 |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.366 |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02550 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.276