NY A05404 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes spent fuel that is pending further or final disposal from a nuclear power station following the permanent cessation of power of operations of such station within the definition of real property.
Title
Includes spent fuel that is pending further or final disposal from a nuclear power station following the permanent cessation of power of operations of such station within the definition of real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S03443 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - referred to real property taxation