NY A05403 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the position of member of the legislature as a part-time, volunteer position in the service of the state; provides that state legislators shall receive no salary, or any other compensation of benefit from the state; authorizes the payment of travel expenses and per diem for days the legislature is in session, provides that per diem is limited to 30 days per annum; provides that the legislature shall convene in regular session only on Saturdays and Sundays in January and February; accelerates the state budget process so that the state budget is enacted on or before the last Sunday of February each year.
Title
Establishes the position of member of the legislature as a part-time, volunteer position in the service of the state; provides that state legislators shall receive no salary, or any other compensation of benefit from the state; authorizes the payment of travel expenses and per diem for days the legislature is in session, provides that per diem is limited to 30 days per annum; provides that the legislature shall convene in regular session only on Saturdays and Sundays in January and February; accelerates the state budget process so that the state budget is enacted on or before the last Sunday of February each year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |