NY A05402 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s4615a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s4615a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the selling or displaying of symbols of hate by municipalities, fire districts, volunteer fire companies, police departments and school districts.
Title
Prohibits the selling or displaying of symbols of hate by municipalities, fire districts, volunteer fire companies, police departments and school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s4615a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.437 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | print number 5402a |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04615 (Same As) 2021-11-02 - SIGNED CHAP.554