NY A05401 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - approval memo.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - approval memo.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to terminal rental adjustment clauses in motor vehicle leases; provides multiple tax payment options for the lessor.
Title
Relates to terminal rental adjustment clauses in motor vehicle leases; provides multiple tax payment options for the lessor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Assembly | approval memo.62 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | signed chap.664 |
2021-11-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1773 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3926 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.365 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03926 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5401