NY A05389 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s3403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s3403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides procedures for resolution of disputes between a public employer and Suffolk county probation officers.
Title
Provides procedures for resolution of disputes between a public employer and Suffolk county probation officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s3403 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.216 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.216 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-02-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03403 (Same As) 2011-09-23 - VETOED MEMO.73