NY A05386 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the soil health and climate resiliency act; establishes the soil health program to assist farmers in improving the health of their soil; establishes the climate resilient farming initiative to promote and encourage farmers to reduce the effects of farming on climate change and to adapt to and mitigate the impact of climate change by improving and maintaining water management systems and soil health and resiliency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the soil health and climate resiliency act; establishes the soil health program to assist farmers in improving the health of their soil; establishes the climate resilient farming initiative to promote and encourage farmers to reduce the effects of farming on climate change and to adapt to and mitigate the impact of climate change by improving and maintaining water management systems and soil health and resiliency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-03Senate3RD READING CAL.1382
2021-06-03SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4722A
2021-05-25SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2021-05-25Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-05-25Assemblypassed assembly
2021-05-25Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.116
2021-05-25Assemblyrules report cal.116
2021-05-25Assemblyreported
2021-05-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-14Assemblyprint number 5386a
2021-05-14Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to agriculture
2021-02-16Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S04722 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5386A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A5386
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05386&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05386
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05386&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05386A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05386&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05386&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05386&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A5386#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback