NY S04722 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5386A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the soil health and climate resiliency act; establishes the soil health program to assist farmers in improving the health of their soil; establishes the climate resilient farming initiative to promote and encourage farmers to reduce the effects of farming on climate change and to adapt to and mitigate the impact of climate change by improving and maintaining water management systems and soil health and resiliency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the soil health and climate resiliency act; establishes the soil health program to assist farmers in improving the health of their soil; establishes the climate resilient farming initiative to promote and encourage farmers to reduce the effects of farming on climate change and to adapt to and mitigate the impact of climate change by improving and maintaining water management systems and soil health and resiliency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A5386A
2021-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1382
2021-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-05-19SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2021-05-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 4722A
2021-05-13SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE
2021-02-10SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A05386 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback