NY A05365 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-30 - print number 5365b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-30 - print number 5365b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an asbestos remediation tax credit; allows for a twenty percent credit of all eligible costs which are incurred as a result of asbestos remediation, not to exceed $1,000,000.
Title
Provides an asbestos remediation tax credit; allows for a twenty percent credit of all eligible costs which are incurred as a result of asbestos remediation, not to exceed $1,000,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Assembly | print number 5365b |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | print number 5365a |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01671 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES