NY A05353 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the registration of sex offenders shall include a statement that the offender is in compliance with certain state, county and local laws relating to residency and employment.
Title
Provides that the registration of sex offenders shall include a statement that the offender is in compliance with certain state, county and local laws relating to residency and employment.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in correction |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | print number 5353a |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2011-02-16 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03325 (Same As) 2012-03-29 - referred to correction