NY A05349 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the report of suspected financial exploitation; requires the superintendent of the department of financial services to develop guidelines relating to reporting suspected financial exploitation; provides that a third party who reports suspected financial abuse shall have immunity from any civil or criminal liability as a result.
Title
Relates to the report of suspected financial exploitation; requires the superintendent of the department of financial services to develop guidelines relating to reporting suspected financial exploitation; provides that a third party who reports suspected financial abuse shall have immunity from any civil or criminal liability as a result.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.125 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.125 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | print number 5349b |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | print number 5349a |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.235 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.235 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S02564 (Same As) 0000-00-00 -