NY A05338 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.602
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.602
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of certain lands in the towns of Cuba, Allegany county and Ischua, Cattaraugus county, and the disbursement of monies from the Cuba lake management fund.
Title
Relates to the sale of certain lands in the towns of Cuba, Allegany county and Ischua, Cattaraugus county, and the disbursement of monies from the Cuba lake management fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Assembly | signed chap.602 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.997 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1753 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.167 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.760 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.760 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01753 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5338