NY A05285 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s2412d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s2412d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the commission on prosecutorial conduct.
Title
Establishes the commission on prosecutorial conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s2412d |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5285c |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.376 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5285b |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.382 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.382 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | print number 5285a |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02412 (Same As) 2018-08-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.2