NY A05266 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - print number 5266b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - print number 5266b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a residential parking system in certain parts of the hamlet of Oceanside in the town of Hempstead near South Nassau Communities Hospital.
Title
Authorizes a residential parking system in certain parts of the hamlet of Oceanside in the town of Hempstead near South Nassau Communities Hospital.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Assembly | print number 5266b |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | print number 5266a |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00089 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - referred to transportation
S08713 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - REFERRED TO RULES
S08713 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - REFERRED TO RULES