NY A05220 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the missing vulnerable adults clearinghouse; provides for plan and implementation programs to ensure the most effective use of federal, state, and local resources in the investigation of missing vulnerable adults; disseminates a directory of resources to assist in locating missing vulnerable adults; provides for cooperation with the department of health, office of mental health, office of mental retardation and developmental disabilities, office for the aging, and other public and private organizations to develop education and prevention programs concerning the safety of vulnerable adults; provides for assistance from federal, state and local agencies in the investigation of cases involving missing vulnerable adults; utilizes available resources to duplicate photographs and posters of vulnerable adults reported as missing by police and disseminate this information throughout the state providing such posters indicate only that the adult is missing with no mention of vulnerability; provides assistance in returning missing vulnerable adults who are located out of state; develops a curriculum for the training of law enforcement personnel investigating cases involving missing vulnerable adults, including recognition and management of vulnerable adults; operates a toll-free twenty-four hour hotline for the public to use to relay information concerning missing vulnerable adults; maintains and makes available to appropriate state and local law enforcement agencies information concerning technological advances that may assist in facilitating the recovery of missing vulnerable adults; takes such other steps as necessary to assist in education, prevention, service provision, and investigation of cases involving missing vulnerable adults.
Title
Creates the missing vulnerable adults clearinghouse; provides for plan and implementation programs to ensure the most effective use of federal, state, and local resources in the investigation of missing vulnerable adults; disseminates a directory of resources to assist in locating missing vulnerable adults; provides for cooperation with the department of health, office of mental health, office of mental retardation and developmental disabilities, office for the aging, and other public and private organizations to develop education and prevention programs concerning the safety of vulnerable adults; provides for assistance from federal, state and local agencies in the investigation of cases involving missing vulnerable adults; utilizes available resources to duplicate photographs and posters of vulnerable adults reported as missing by police and disseminate this information throughout the state providing such posters indicate only that the adult is missing with no mention of vulnerability; provides assistance in returning missing vulnerable adults who are located out of state; develops a curriculum for the training of law enforcement personnel investigating cases involving missing vulnerable adults, including recognition and management of vulnerable adults; operates a toll-free twenty-four hour hotline for the public to use to relay information concerning missing vulnerable adults; maintains and makes available to appropriate state and local law enforcement agencies information concerning technological advances that may assist in facilitating the recovery of missing vulnerable adults; takes such other steps as necessary to assist in education, prevention, service provision, and investigation of cases involving missing vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-16 | tabled | |
2010-08-13 | vetoed memo.6751 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-05-11 | 3RD READING CAL.487 | |
2010-05-11 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2056B | |
2010-03-17 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-03-17 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-17 | passed assembly | |
2010-03-01 | amended on third reading 5220b | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.366 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-18 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-18 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-18 | ordered to third reading rules cal.492 | |
2009-06-18 | rules report cal.492 | |
2009-06-18 | reported | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-17 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-15 | print number 5220a | |
2009-06-15 | amend (t) and recommit to codes | |
2009-06-15 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-02-11 | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S2056-B (Same As) 2010-05-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5220B