NY A05164 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - advanced to third reading cal.245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that in grand jury proceedings when following submission to a grand jury of a criminal charge or charges, the grand jury dismisses all charges presented or directs the district attorney to dismiss all charges or directs the DA to file in a local criminal court an application for disclosure of certain materials; authorizes the court to limit disclosure of certain items where there is a reasonable likelihood that such disclosure may lead to the identity of a witness who is not a public servant or expert witness; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that in grand jury proceedings when following submission to a grand jury of a criminal charge or charges, the grand jury dismisses all charges presented or directs the district attorney to dismiss all charges or directs the DA to file in a local criminal court an application for disclosure of certain materials; authorizes the court to limit disclosure of certain items where there is a reasonable likelihood that such disclosure may lead to the identity of a witness who is not a public servant or expert witness; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.245
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-02-07Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02185 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - REFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback