NY A05105 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-13 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a defined contribution plan for all non-civil service appointees and elected officials of the New York state and local employees' retirement system who are not yet vested in a state retirement system or who are hired after the effective date of this section; authorizes elected officials to join such defined contribution plan; defines terms; provides for contributions to such defined contribution plan; authorizes the promulgation of any necessary rules and regulations.
Title
Establishes a defined contribution plan for all non-civil service appointees and elected officials of the New York state and local employees' retirement system who are not yet vested in a state retirement system or who are hired after the effective date of this section; authorizes elected officials to join such defined contribution plan; defines terms; provides for contributions to such defined contribution plan; authorizes the promulgation of any necessary rules and regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2014-02-05 | Assembly | print number 5105a |
2014-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04706 (Same As) 2014-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 4706A