NY A05061 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.242
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.242
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits Iglesia La Luz Del Mundo, Inc. to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions for the 2017-2018 school taxes and 2018 general tax rolls.
Title
Permits Iglesia La Luz Del Mundo, Inc. to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions for the 2017-2018 school taxes and 2018 general tax rolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.242 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.193 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | substituted for a5061a |
2020-03-02 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.447 |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s7334 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.193 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.491 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.491 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | print number 5061a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07334 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.242